EP0524331 - Soldering procedure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Solar GmbH Frankfurter Ring 152 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states Siemens Solar GmbH Frankfurter Ring 152 D-80807 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holdermann, Konstantin, Dipl.-Chem. A. Immingerstrasse 2 W-8875 Offingen / DE | 02 /
Münzer, Adolf, Dipl.-Phys. Orleansstrasse 67 W-8000 München 80 / DE | 03 /
Riermeier, Manfred Finkenweg 1 W-8059 Oberneuching / DE | 04 /
Schuber, Viktor Schlehenring 24a W-8011 Kirchheim / DE | 05 /
Zinke, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys. Stolzingstrasse 10 W-8000 München 81 / DE | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112280.2 | 22.07.1991 | [1993/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524331 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524331 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K3/047 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
B23K3/08 (EP);
H05K3/3485 (EP);
H05K3/3494 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/12] |
Former [1993/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Lötverfahren | [1993/04] | English: | Soldering procedure | [1993/04] | French: | Procédé de brasage tendre | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, GR, LU, NL, SE | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.08.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3015713 (ECKLER RICHARD C, et al); | [Y]EP0002550 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR], et al) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN Bd. 32, Nr. 10B, März 1990, ARMONK, NY, USA Seiten 456 - 457; 'COMPLIANT THERMODE FOR SURFACE SOLDER' | [Y] - E. LÜDER 'HANDBUCH DER LÖTTECHNIK' 1952 , VERLAG TECHNIK BERLIN , BERLIN, DE |