EP0457370 - Method for the pasteurization of the tissue protein PP4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 35001 Marburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löbermann, Hartmut Dr. Mosswaldstrasse 7B W-7801 Schallstadt / DE | 02 /
Bornmann, Chritiane Steinweg 32 W-3573 Gemünden (Wohra) / DE | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/37] |
Former [1992/21] | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1991/47] | Klein, Otto, Dr. Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, Patentbüro D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112381.8 | 15.12.1987 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | DE19863643182 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3643182 | [1991/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457370 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457370 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/50, A61K38/02, A61L2/00 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
A61L2/0023 (EP,US);
A61K35/50 (KR);
A61L2/04 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K14/4721 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L2/0023, A61L2/04, A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/47] | A61K35/50, A61K37/02, A61L2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Pasteurisierung des Gewebeproteins PP4 | [1991/47] | English: | Method for the pasteurization of the tissue protein PP4 | [1991/47] | French: | Procédé pour la pasteurisation de la protéine tissulaire PP4 | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87118598.9 / EP0271885 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0106269 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]); | [YD]EP0123307 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) | [A] - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, Band 151, Nr. 3, 16. September 1985, Seiten 625-629, FEBS; C.P.M. REUTELINGSPERGER et al.: "Isolation and partial purification of a novel anticoagulant from arteries of human umbilical cord" | Examination | EP0317341 |