EP0478914 - Leucocyte depleting filter device and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 30 Sea Cliff Avenue Glen Cove, New York 11542 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 30 Sea Cliff Avenue Glen Cove New York 11542 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gsell, Thomas C. 40 Valentine Avenue Glen Cove, New York 11542 / US | 02 /
Matkovich, Vlado I. 11 Old Estate Road Glen Cove, New York 11542 / US | 03 /
Bormann, Thomas 2365 Willoughby Avenue Seaford, New York 11783 / US | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/15] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. Bardehle, Pagenberg & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112503.7 | 25.07.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | US19900558468 | 27.07.1990 Original published format: US 558468 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0478914 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478914 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/34 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
A61M1/3633 (EP,US);
B01D39/1623 (EP);
A61M2202/0439 (EP);
A61M2205/7536 (EP);
A61M2206/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0439, A61M2202/0057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1992/15] | Title | German: | Filtereinrichtung zur Entfernung von Leukozyten und Methode zur Verwendung | [1992/15] | English: | Leucocyte depleting filter device and method of use | [1992/15] | French: | Dispositif de filtration pour enlever des leucocytes et méthode d'emploi | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4115277 (SWANK ROY L); | [X]EP0155003 (ASAHI MEDICAL CO [JP]); | [AD]US4726901 (PALL DAVID B [US], et al); | [YD]EP0313348 (PALL CORP [US]); | [X]EP0315022 (NISSHO KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0327136 (PALL CORP [US]); | [X]EP0333119 (TERUMO CORP [JP]); | [YD]US4880548 (PALL DAVID B [US], et al); | [A]EP0370584 (AKZO NV [NL]) | [A] - VOX SANGUINIS, vol. 23,1972 P. DIEPENHORST et al. "Removal of Leukocytes from whole blood and Erythrocyte suspensions by filtration through cotton wool" pages 308-320 |