EP0469499 - Driving device for loading/unloading a tray for a digital audio tape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOLDSTAR ALPS ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 20 Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul / KR | [1992/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeng, Hyun Jin 206-509 Zoogong 2nd Apt., Hokye 1-dong Anyang-si, Kyonggi-do / KR | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Kahler, Kurt Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112683.7 | 27.07.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | KR20110057590 | 30.07.1990 Original published format: KR 1157590 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0469499 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0469499 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/675 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
G11B15/67549 (EP,US);
G11B15/60 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/06] | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung für das Laden/Entladen von einer Lade für digitales Tonband | [1992/06] | English: | Driving device for loading/unloading a tray for a digital audio tape | [1992/06] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement d'un tiroir de chargement/éjection pour bande digitale audio | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/27] | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0317370 (GOLD STAR CO [KR]); | [Y]EP0219041 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [AD]DE3942439 (GOLDSTAR ALPS ELECTRONICS CO [KR]); | [A]US4930720 (HWANG HAK S [KR]); | [A]GB2224876 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US4423445 (OKADA HITOSHI [JP], et al) |