EP0469539 - Continuously magnetizing magnet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN LIFE COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, 3 chome Higashiikebukuro Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states JAPAN LIFE COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, 3 chome Higashiikebukuro Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Takayoshi, c/o Japan Life Co., Ltd. No. 1-1, Higashiikebukuro 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Isamu, c/o Japan Life Co., Ltd. No. 1-1, Higashiikebukuro 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/06] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/06] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112782.7 | 30.07.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | JP19900080890U | 30.07.1990 Original published format: JP 8089090 U | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0469539 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/02 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
H01F7/0294 (EP,US);
H01F7/0215 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | Dauermagnetisierender Magnet | [1992/06] | English: | Continuously magnetizing magnet | [1992/06] | French: | Aimant à magnétisation continue | [1992/06] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/34] | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2506340 (HERMSDORF KERAMIK VEB); | [A]US3665355 (SASAKI KENKICHI, et al); | [A]US4185262 (FUNAKOSHI YASUTOMO [JP], et al); | [AD]JPH02224303 (APOLLO IRYOKI KK) |