EP0458373 - Image shake detecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekine, Masayoshi 1-10, Ichigaya-nakano-cho Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Toshiyuki 2-1-8, Shibamata Katsushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kai, Takashi 1505-2, Tsurumaki Hatano-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoshimura, Katsuji 7-5, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 05 /
Toyama, Masamichi 3-17, Honmoku-motomachi, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112875.9 | 08.03.1989 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | JP19880057670 | 10.03.1988 Original published format: JP 5767088 | JP19880092695 | 15.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9269588 | JP19880092697 | 15.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9269788 | JP19880123625 | 19.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12362588 | JP19880269554 | 27.10.1988 Original published format: JP 26955488 | JP19890027038 | 06.02.1989 Original published format: JP 2703889 | [1991/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0458373 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0458373 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458373 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/225 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
G01S3/7864 (EP,US);
H04N23/686 (EP,US);
G06T7/223 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
H04N23/6811 (EP,US);
H04N23/6815 (EP,US);
H04N23/687 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/48] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Feststellung von Bildzittern | [1991/48] | English: | Image shake detecting device | [1991/48] | French: | Détecteur de tremblotements d'image | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89104111.3 / EP0332169 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2751286 (CIT ALCATEL); | [A]US4179730 (ANTONOV BORIS M [SU], et al); | [A]GB2061545 (MARCONI CO LTD); | [A]US4410914 (SIAU JOHN E [US]); | [A]US4531158 (MURAKAMI TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0180446 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4638366 (YOSHIMURA YASUO [JP], et al); | [A]US4717959 (ISAGO KOKI [JP]); | [AP]DE3643870 (BROADCAST TELEVISION SYST [DE]); | [AP]DE3707770 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [APD]US4788596 (KAWAKAMI EIGO [JP], et al) |