Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2234348 | 31.07.1991 | B | GB2234348 | 30.01.1991 | A | GB9015271D0 | 29.08.1990 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8723558 | 07.10.1987 | GB8629045 | 04.12.1986 | GB9015271 | 11.07.1990 | GB8728271 | 03.12.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8629045D0 | 14.01.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8629045 | 04.12.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8723558D0 | 11.11.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8723558 | 07.10.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63214648 | 07.09.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8629045 | 04.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0270363 | Global Dossier | 02.11.1988 | A3 | EP0270363 | 08.06.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8723558 | 07.10.1987 | GB8629045 | 04.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0464861 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1992 | A3 | EP0464861 | 08.01.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8723558 | 07.10.1987 | GB8629045 | 04.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2200210 | 24.07.1991 | B | GB2200210 | 27.07.1988 | A | GB8728271D0 | 06.01.1988 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8723558 | 07.10.1987 | GB8629045 | 04.12.1986 | Type | Earlier application | EP0270363 |