EP0464861 - Apparatus for reactions with liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF LEICESTER University Road Leicester Leicestershire LE1 7RH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF LEICESTER University Road Leicester, LE1 7RH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauder, Ian, The Dep. of Pathology Clinical Sciences Building Leicester Royal Infirmary P.O. Box 65, Leicester LE2 7LX / GB | 02 /
Warford, Anthony, The Dep. of Pathology Clinical Sciences Building Leicester Royal Infirmary P.O. Box 65, Leicester LE2 7LX / GB | 03 /
MaWhinney, William Henry Brian 7 Harley Terrace Gosforth, Newcastle-upon-Tyne / GB | 04 /
Rae, Malcolm J. L., The Dep. of Pathology Clinical Sciences Building Leicester Royal Infirmary P.O. Box 65, Leicester LE2 7LX / GB | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | McNeight, David Leslie, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | McNeight, David Leslie, et al McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91113165.4 | 03.12.1987 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | GB19860029045 | 04.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8629045 | GB19870023558 | 07.10.1987 Original published format: GB 8723558 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464861 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464861 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/30 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G01N1/312 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Durchführen von Reaktionen mit Flüssigkeiten | [1992/02] | English: | Apparatus for reactions with liquids | [1992/02] | French: | Appareil pour effectuer des réactions avec des liquides | [1992/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/06] | 02.07.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87310636.3 / EP0270363 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2849713 ; | [X]US2940360 ; | [YD]GB1454365 ; | [A]US4039247 | [Y] - BIOMEDIZINISCHE TECHNIK vol. 20, no. 4, 1975, BERLIN pages 139 - 143; LAMBERT: 'EINE NEUE VERSUCHSANORDNUNG FÜR DIE DIREKTE MIKROSKOPISCHE BEOBACHTUNG DES FLIESVERHALTENS VON BLUT IN MODELLEN NATÜRLICHER UND KÜNSTLICHER GEFÄSSSYTEME' |