EP0472068 - Ring spinning or twisting machine with a suction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Horst Rigistrasse 8 W-8185 Winkel b. Bülach / DE | 02 /
Lattion, André Gotthelfstrasse 51 CH-8472 Seuzach / CH | [1992/09] | Application number, filing date | 91113419.5 | 09.08.1991 | [1992/09] | Priority number, date | CH19900002702 | 21.08.1990 Original published format: CH 270290 | [1992/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472068 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D01H11/00, D01H5/66 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
D01H5/66 (EP,US);
D01H11/005 (EP,US);
Y02P70/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [1992/09] | Title | German: | Ringspinn- oder Zwirnmaschine mit Absaugeinrichtung | [1992/09] | English: | Ring spinning or twisting machine with a suction device | [1992/09] | French: | Métier à filer ou à retordre à anneaux avec dispositif d'aspiration | [1992/09] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/47] | 18.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62062936 ; | [X]US3412545 (OSCAR LIPPUNER EMIL); | [Y]DE2244668 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH); | [A]DE2419188 (LTG LUFTTECHNISCHE GMBH); | [A]FR2232628 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN [DE]); | [A]DE3642038 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]); | [AD]GB982604 (TMM RESEARCH LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 262 (C-442)[2709], 25. August 1987; & JP-A-62 062 936 (NISSHINBO IND. INC.) 19-03-1987, & JP62062936 A 00000000 |