EP0459535 - Apparatus for the surgical treatment of tissues by hyperthermia, preferably the prostate, with cooling means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UROLOGIX, INC. 14405 21st Avenue North Minneapolis, MN 55447 / US | [2001/03] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states TECHNOMED MEDICAL SYSTEMS 4, rue du Dauphiné F-69120 Vaulx-en-Velin / FR | ||
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states TECHNOMED MEDICAL SYSTEMS Parc d'activités du Chêne, Boulevard des Droits de l'Homme F-69500 Bron / FR | ||
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states TECHNOMED INTERNATIONAL Le Ponant 1 11 rue Leblanc F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hascoet, Gérard 10, avenue Colonel Bonnet F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Lacoste, François 61, rue Boileau F-69006 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Cathaud, Muriel 13, rue des Tamaris F-69780 Venissieux / FR | 04 /
Jacomino, Jean-Marie 5, rue Maréchal Foch F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 05 /
Devonec, Marian 81, avenue des Balmes F-01700 Miribel / FR | 06 /
Perrin, Paul 2 Place Ollier F-69007 Lyon / FR | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Hermann, Gerhard, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Hermann, Gerhard, Dr., et al Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al Cabinet HIRSCH-DESROUSSEAUX-POCHART, 34 rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/03] | Pochart, François, et al Cabinet Hirsch-Desrousseaux-Pochart, 34 rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/49] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91113481.5 | 21.11.1989 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | FR19880015126 | 21.11.1988 Original published format: FR 8815126 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0459535 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0459535 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459535 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/02, A61N5/04 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
A61N5/02 (EP,US);
A61N5/01 (KR);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B90/04 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22058 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00011 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00023 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00101 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00166 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00744 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/183 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3782 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/49] | A61N5/04, A61F7/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur chirurgischen Behandlung von Geweben mit Hyperthermie, vorzugsweise der Prostata versehen mit Kühlvorrichtung | [1991/49] | English: | Apparatus for the surgical treatment of tissues by hyperthermia, preferably the prostate, with cooling means | [1991/49] | French: | Appareil de traitement chirurgical de tissus par hyperthermie de préférence la prostate, avec moyens de refroidissement | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 01.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.05.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 14.03.2002 | Appeal received No. T0634/02 | 21.05.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.07.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 14.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89403199.6 / EP0370890 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.12.1993 | 30.11.1995 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.1996 | 30.11.2002 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2003 | 30.11.2005 | 17   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | BE | 19.03.2008 | IT | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | ES | 30.06.2008 | LU | 21.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 21.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4202336 (VAN GERVEN HANS [DE]); | [AD]EP0248758 (BIODAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS LTD [IL]); | [E]US4967765 (TURNER PAUL F [US], et al) | [AD] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 13TH ANNUAL NORTHEAST BIOENGINEERING CONFERENCE, Philadelphia, PA, 12th - 13th March 1987, pages 390-393, IEEE, New York, US; T.P. RYAN et al.: "SAR evaluation of interstitial clinical heating for biliary obstruction due to cancer" | Examination | DE2407559 | US4375220 | US4601296 | - HARADA ET AL, "Microwave surgical treatment of diseases of the prostate", UROLOGY, vol. XXVI, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/0090-4295(85)90364-4, pages 572 - 576, XP023270704 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0090-4295(85)90364-4 | - MCGUIRE RICK, "Transurethral hyperthermia for BPH: trial's goal is to top 80% success", MEDICAL TRIBUNE, (19880331), pages 12 - 14 |