EP0473978 - Two-wheeled vehicle control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikegami, Masahiko K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Hatanaka, Kaoru K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Fincke, Karl Theodor, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/11] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91113519.2 | 12.08.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | JP19900215327 | 15.08.1990 Original published format: JP 21532790 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473978 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473978 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B62K21/00 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
B60Q1/122 (EP,US);
B62J6/023 (EP,US);
B62K21/00 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/112 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/116 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/122 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1992/11] | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtung für Zweiradfahrzeug | [1992/11] | English: | Two-wheeled vehicle control apparatus | [1992/11] | French: | Moyen de commande pour véhicules à deux roues | [1992/11] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3827149 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 22 (M-354)(1745) 30 January 1985 & JP-59 167 374 ( YAMAHA HATSUDOKI K.K. ) 20 September 1984 |