EP0473996 - Advertising support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDIA-AGENTUR BLUME u. EHL GmbH Eigenheim 5 D-41747 Viersen / DE | [1992/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehl, Josef Eigenheim 5 W-4060 Viersen 1 / DE | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Uhlmann, Johannes Hofstrasse 83 41747 Viersen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | Uhlmann, Hans, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. Hofstrasse 83 D-41747 Viersen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91113785.9 | 16.08.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | DE19900011915U | 17.08.1990 Original published format: DE 9011915 U | DE19914110183 | 28.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4110183 | [1992/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473996 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09F1/08, A47F5/11, G09F15/00 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
G09F15/0068 (EP);
A47F5/105 (EP);
A47F5/118 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/11] | Title | German: | Werbeträger | [1992/11] | English: | Advertising support | [1992/11] | French: | Support de publicité | [1992/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 31.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/15] | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.1993 | 31.08.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3941112 ; | [A]US4372086 ; | [A]US4302897 (DECKYS JONAS E); | [A]DE3306767 |