EP0473034 - Polyamides with an improved fluidity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinz, Hans-Detlef, Dr. Breslauerstrasse 31 W-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Dhein, Rolf, Dr. Deswatinesstrasse 30 W-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Stahlke, Kurt-Rainer, Dr. Amselweg 20 W-5067 Kürten 2 / DE | [1992/10] | Application number, filing date | 91113814.7 | 17.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | DE19904027374 | 30.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4027374 | [1992/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473034 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D177/00, C09D177/02, C09D177/06, C08L77/00, C08L77/02, C08L77/06 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
C09D177/06 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP);
C08L77/02 (EP);
C08L77/06 (EP);
C09D177/00 (EP);
C09D177/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/26 (EP);
C08L77/02, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L77/06, C08L2666/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/10] | Title | German: | Polyamide mit verbesserter Fliessfähigkeit | [1992/10] | English: | Polyamides with an improved fluidity | [1992/10] | French: | Polyamides à écoulement amélioré | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57126866 ; | [X]JP55054374 ; | [X]JP7301225 ; | [X]DE1249736 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 223 (C-133), 9. November 1982; & JP-A-57 126 866 (PENTEL) 06-08-1982, & JP57126866 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 89 (C-016), 25. Juni 1980; & JP-A-55 054 374 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE) 21-04-1980, & JP55054374 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 80, Nr. 8, 25. Februar 1974, Seiten 80-81, Zusammenfassung Nr. 38489f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-73 01 225 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. et al.) 16-01-1973, & JP7301225 A 00000000 |