EP0485698 - Hay making machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Niemeyer Söhne GmbH & Co. KG Heinrich-Niemeyer-Strasse 52, Postfach 11 65 D-48466 Hörstel / DE | [1992/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosel, Hans Dieter Barbarastrasse 30 W-4530 Ibbenbüren / DE | 02 /
Eder, Wolfgang Am Rahlbusch 6 W-3340 Wolfenbüttel / DE | [1992/21] | Application number, filing date | 91114216.4 | 24.08.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | DE19900014438U | 18.10.1990 Original published format: DE 9014438 U | [1992/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0485698 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0485698 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485698 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01D78/12, A01D78/10 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
A01D78/125 (EP);
A01D78/1014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Heuwerbungsmaschine | [1992/21] | English: | Hay making machine | [1992/21] | French: | Machine de fenaison | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Request for further processing for: | 02.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 09.07.1997 | ES | 09.07.1997 | FR | 09.07.1997 | IT | 09.07.1997 | NL | 09.07.1997 | AT | 24.08.1997 | CH | 31.08.1997 | LI | 31.08.1997 | SE | 09.10.1997 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/07] | DK | 09.07.1997 | |
ES | 09.07.1997 | ||
IT | 09.07.1997 | ||
NL | 09.07.1997 | ||
AT | 24.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
SE | 09.10.1997 | ||
FR | 05.12.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 09.07.1997 | |
ES | 09.07.1997 | ||
IT | 09.07.1997 | ||
AT | 24.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
SE | 09.10.1997 | ||
FR | 05.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 09.07.1997 | |
IT | 09.07.1997 | ||
AT | 24.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
SE | 09.10.1997 | ||
FR | 05.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/01] | DK | 09.07.1997 | |
AT | 24.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
SE | 09.10.1997 | ||
FR | 05.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/45] | DK | 09.07.1997 | |
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
SE | 09.10.1997 | ||
FR | 05.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | DK | 09.07.1997 | |
SE | 09.10.1997 | ||
FR | 05.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 09.07.1997 | |
SE | 09.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 09.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1352702 (BUCHER GUYER AG MASCH) [A] 1,2,6 * page 2, column L, paragraph 3 - page 3, column L, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2010323 (STOLL WALTER) [A] 1,6,7 * page 7, line 19 - line 34; figures 1,4,6,8,11,13 *; | [YA]GB1191487 (STOLL WALTER [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5-7 * page 2, line 90 - page 4, line 21; figures 1-7,12 * [A] 2; | [A]FR2346958 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]); | [X]DE2828282 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [X] 8,9,13 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2435895 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 28; figures 1-6 *; | [DA]DE3000820 (NIEMEYER GMBH & CO KG SOEHNE [DE]) [DA] 1,6 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1,3-6 * * page 12, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 1 *; | [A]EP0130617 (STOLL MASCHF GMBH WILHELM [DE]); | [A]DE3418352 (HOELZLE MAX) [A] 8,10 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE3543729 (MOOSBRUCKER KARL [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5-7 * column 2, line 24 - line 63; figures 1-3 * [A] 4; | [A]DE3628604 (FELLA WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 5, line 23 - line 51; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0316896 (NIEMEYER GMBH & CO KG SOEHNE [DE]) [A] 12 * figure 1; claim 1 * |