EP0477545 - Shift control system for an automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baba, Fumiaki 4-4, Takaya-Takamigaoka 2-chome Higashi-Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Kitada, Masahito 4-12, Mukainadahon-machi, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Kamada, Shinya 11-5, Ohzu 5-chome, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Koichiro 3-19, Miyazono 6-chome Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 05 /
Fujiwara, Takuji 5-19-510, Minami-Taisho-machi, Kaita-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 06 /
Mizobe, Tatsutoshi 2-8-502, Kinya-cho, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91114299.0 | 26.08.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | JP19900227813 | 28.08.1990 Original published format: JP 22781390 | JP19900261394 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: JP 26139490 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477545 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477545 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477545 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F16H61/16 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
F16H61/16 (EP,US);
F16H61/0246 (EP,US);
F16H61/0206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/14] | Title | German: | Gangwechseleinrichtung eines automatischen Getriebes | [1992/14] | English: | Shift control system for an automatic transmission | [1992/14] | French: | Système de commande pour le changement de vitesses d'une transmission automatique | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4829853 (SAKAGUCHI YOSHIKAZU [JP]); | [A]GB2109064 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]US4346626 (KAWAMOTO MUTSUMI) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 212 (M-710)(3059) 17 June 1988 | Examination | JP63103949 | US4222292 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 212 (M-710)(3059) 17 June 1988 &JP-A-63 103 949 (AISIN WARNER) 21 January 1988, & JP63103949 A 19880121 |