EP0475184 - Process for the production of peptides by solid phase synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breipohl, Gerhard, Dr. Geisenheimer Strasse 95 W-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Knolle, Jochen, Dr. Höchster Strasse 21 W-6239 Kriftel / DE | 03 /
König, Wolfgang, Dr. Eppsteiner Strasse 25 W-6238 Hofheim a. Ts. / DE | [1992/12] | Application number, filing date | 91114332.9 | 27.08.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | DE19904027394 | 30.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4027394 | [1992/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0475184 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475184 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/04, C07K1/06, C07K7/10 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
C07K1/04 (EP);
C07K1/06 (KR);
C07K1/00 (KR);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL [1992/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Peptiden mittels Festphasensynthese | [1992/12] | English: | Process for the production of peptides by solid phase synthesis | [1992/12] | French: | Procédé de production de peptides par synthèse à phase solide | [1992/12] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 17.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0322348 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |