EP0477574 - Distribution device for beam waveguides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauf, Günter Höfatsstrasse 2 D-8901 Langweid/Lech / DE | 02 /
Blondeel, Geert Grote Steenweg 306 B-9260 Oordegem / BE | [1992/14] | Application number, filing date | 91114482.2 | 28.08.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | DE19904030303 | 25.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4030303 | DE19904030301 | 25.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4030301 | [1992/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477574 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
G02B6/3833 (EP);
G02B6/3846 (EP);
G02B6/44524 (EP);
G02B6/44528 (EP);
G02B6/3806 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/14] | Title | German: | Verteilereinrichtung für Lichtwellenleiter | [1992/14] | English: | Distribution device for beam waveguides | [1992/14] | French: | Dispositif de distribution pour des guides d'ondes lumineuses | [1992/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2846951 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4678264 (BOWEN TERRY P [US], et al); | [A]US4787706 (CANNON JR THOMAS C [US], et al); | [A]DE3826927 (MITTWEIDA ING HOCHSCHULE [DD]) |