blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0476385

EP0476385 - Process for the preparation of a granular insoluble sulfur having improved flowability, vulcanizing agent and rubber composition containing said sulfur [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  05.06.1998
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.1998Opposition rejectedpublished on 22.07.1998 [1998/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIKOKU CHEMICALS CORPORATION
147-1-Minato-machi Marugame-shi
Kagawa-ken / JP
[1992/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Koga, Yukihiro
5, Wakaba-cho 8-chome, Tadotsu-cho
Nakatadotsu-gun, Kagawa-ken / JP
02 / Matsuoka, Tadahiko
260, Nishi-nijo, Kakihara, Yoshino-cho
Itano-gun, Tokushima-ken / JP
03 / Sasa, Masatoshi
667, Higashibun,Iino-cho
Marugame-shi, Kagawa-ken / JP
[1992/13]
Representative(s)Hiltl, Elmar, et al
Diehl & Partner Postfach 34 01 15
80098 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/13]Hiltl, Elmar, Dr., et al
DIEHL.GLAESER.HILTL & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Postfach 19 03 65
D-80603 München / DE
Application number, filing date91114486.328.08.1991
[1992/13]
Priority number, dateJP1990022742928.08.1990         Original published format: JP 22742990
JP1991009283630.03.1991         Original published format: JP 9283691
[1992/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0476385
Date:25.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0476385
Date:05.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:C01B17/12, C08K3/06, C08L21/00
[1992/13]
CPC:
C01B17/12 (EP); C08K3/06 (EP)
C-Set:
C08K3/06, C08L21/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [1992/13]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von nicht löslichem granuliertem Schwefel mit verbesserter Fliessfähigkeit, Vulkanisierungsmittel und Schwefel enthaltende Gummizusammensetzungen[1992/13]
English:Process for the preparation of a granular insoluble sulfur having improved flowability, vulcanizing agent and rubber composition containing said sulfur[1992/13]
French:Procédé pour préparation de foufre insoluble granulé avec fluidité amélioré, agent de vulcanisation et composition de caoutchouc contenant ledit soufre[1992/13]
Examination procedure10.04.1992Examination requested  [1992/24]
09.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.09.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.1994Fee for grant paid
01.12.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.01.1996  19.01.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Quelle-Fontijn, Monique
Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 [1996/10]
19.02.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.07.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.11.1997Date of oral proceedings
23.02.1998Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/30]
23.02.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.1998Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP62246810  ;
 [A]GB1096599  ;
 [A]EP0011384  ;
 [A]US2667406  ;
 [A]FR2108435  ;
 [A]FR2603273  ;
 [A]EP0170104
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 128 (C-489)20 April 1988 & JP-A-62 246 810 ( SHIKOKU CHEM CORP ), & JP62246810 A 19880420
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.