EP0482318 - Controlled deflection roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Gladbacher Strasse 457 47805 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Gladbacher Strasse 457 D-47805 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Küsters, Karl-Heinz Herm. Schumacher Strasse 49 W-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Palgen, Peter Palgen, Schumacher & Kolllegen Frühlingstrasse 46A 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Palgen, Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Peter Palgen, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. H. Schumacher, Mulvanystrasse 2 D-40239 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91114596.9 | 30.08.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | DE19904033638 | 23.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4033638 | [1992/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482318 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/00 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
D21G1/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | Durchbiegungssteuerbare Walze | [1992/18] | English: | Controlled deflection roll | [1992/18] | French: | Rouleau à réglage de la flexion | [1992/18] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 01.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/35] | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3766620 (ROERIG A); | [A]GB2046869 (VALMET OY); | [A]EP0043119 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]); | [AD]DE3623028 ; | [AD]DE3645034 |