blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0474127

EP0474127 - Improved dishwashing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.04.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.1993 [1993/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 45
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1992/11]For all designated states
MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 45
I-60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Bongini, Dino
Via Marconi 36
I-60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
02 / Duri, Sandro
Via Orpiano 15
I-62020 Fiuminata (MC) / IT
[1992/11]
Application number, filing date91114599.330.08.1991
[1992/11]
Priority number, dateIT1990006766806.09.1990         Original published format: IT 6766890
[1992/11]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0474127
Date:11.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:A47L15/23
[1992/11]
CPC:
A47L15/23 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1992/11]
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Geschirrspülmaschine[1992/11]
English:Improved dishwashing machine[1992/11]
French:Machine à laver la vaisselle ameliorée[1992/11]
File destroyed:07.08.2001
Examination procedure12.09.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/20]
17.12.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1993/20]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]SU1294339  ;
 [X]US1908617  (JOHN RODEWALD);
 [A]GB633496  (ELECTROLUX AB);
 [X]GB833434  (SVEN GUSTAF NORD);
 [X]US3285779  (DUNHAM ANSEL W);
 [A]DE1628547  (CONSTRUCTA WERKE GMBH);
 [A]WO8301186  (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]);
 [A]US4418868  (GURUBATHAM VINCENT P [US], et al)
 [X]  - SOVIET PATENTS ABSTRACTS Section PQ, Week 8739, 7 October 1987 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class P28AN 87-276353/39 & SU-A-1 294 339 (ELECTR HOUSE MACHIN) 4 January 1985
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.