EP0477645 - Procedure for constructing a support for the front wheel suspension of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [1997/50] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ravizza, Renato Strada Miravalle, 19/10 I-10024 Moncalieri / IT | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Boggio, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 91115212.2 | 09.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | IT19900067715 | 25.09.1990 Original published format: IT 6771590 | [1992/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477645 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477645 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60G13/00, B60G15/07 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
B60G13/006 (EP);
B60G2202/312 (EP);
B60G2204/1242 (EP);
B60G2204/129 (EP);
B60G2204/418 (EP);
B60G2206/50 (EP);
B60G2206/722 (EP);
B60G2206/8103 (EP);
B60G2206/8201 (EP);
B60G2206/82013 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1992/14] | Title | German: | Konstruktionsverfahren für eine Vorderradaufhängungsstütze eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1992/14] | English: | Procedure for constructing a support for the front wheel suspension of a motor vehicle | [1992/14] | French: | Méthode pour construire un support de la suspension de roue avant d'un véhicule automobile | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.12.1997 | SE | 10.03.1998 | [2002/25] |
Former [1998/35] | SE | 10.03.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2020235 (BENDIX CORP); | [A]GB2026404 (FIAT AUTO SPA); | [A]FR2472487 (IAO INDUSTRIE RIUNITE SPA [IT]); | [A]FR2519588 (SIETTE SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0108041 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]); | [A]US4761018 (ABBRUZZI JOSEPH A [US], et al); | [A]EP0332915 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) |