EP0484657 - Device for the temporary storage and controlled feeding of volatile fuel components into the induction pipe of a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1994 [1994/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sausner, Andreas Hainbuchenstrasse 14a W-6000 Frankfurt 71 / DE | 02 /
Zabeck, Sebastian Robert-Bosch-Strasse 13 W-6944 Hemsbach / DE | [1992/20] | Application number, filing date | 91115257.7 | 10.09.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | DE19904035158 | 06.11.1990 Original published format: DE 4035158 | [1992/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484657 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484657 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/08, B60K15/035 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
F02M25/0836 (EP,US);
B60K15/03504 (EP,US);
F02M25/0809 (EP,US);
F02M2025/0845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum vorübergehenden Speichern und dosierten Einspeisen flüchtiger Kraftstoffbestandteile in das Ansaugrohr einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1992/20] | English: | Device for the temporary storage and controlled feeding of volatile fuel components into the induction pipe of a combustion engine | [1992/20] | French: | Dispositif pour l'emmagasinage provisoire et l'alimentation dosée de composants volatiles du carburant dans le tube d'aspiration d'un moteur à combustion | [1992/20] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3624441 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [YD]DE3802664 ; | [A]US4949695 (URANISHI KOUJI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO9011443 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |