EP0480189 - Pharmaceutical compositions for topical use comprising hyaluronic acid sodium salt and disinfectant substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALTERGON S.A. Via Dogana Vecchia, 2 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | [1992/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donati Pedemonti, Elisabetta Via Rimembranza, 1/B I-22100 Como / IT | 02 /
Lualdi, Paolo Via Baradello, 1 I-22070 Grandate / IT | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl Viale Bianca Maria 33 I-20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1992/16] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl 33, Viale Bianca Maria I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91115360.9 | 11.09.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | IT19900021662 | 05.10.1990 Original published format: IT 2166290 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480189 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480189 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/73, // (A61K31/73, 31:635, 31:05, 31:505) | [1992/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/715 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/715, A61K31/635, A61K31/05, A61K31/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/16] | Title | German: | Hyaluronsäurenatriumsalz und Desinfektionsmittel enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen zur äusserlichen Anwendung | [1992/16] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions for topical use comprising hyaluronic acid sodium salt and disinfectant substances | [1992/16] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique à usage topique contenant du sel de sodium de l'acide hyaluronique et des désinfectants | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 17.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Prof. Aurelio Romeo Viale Ippocrate 93 Roma / IT Opponent's representative Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Prof. Aurelio Romeo Viale Ippocrate 93 Roma / IT Opponent's representative Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | 27.01.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.10.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.09.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/49] | Appeal following opposition | 01.02.1999 | Appeal received No. T0112/99 | 01.04.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.09.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 25.09.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.10.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1240545 (RESEARCH CORP [US]); | [XD]US4736024 (DELLA VALLE FRANCESCO [IT], et al) | [A] - RIV. ITAL. PLAST. (ITALY), vol. 19, no. 4, 1987, PADOVA, pages 635-644; SILIPRANDI et al.: "Hyaluronic acid effects on deep burns healing" |