EP0475427 - A heating element and a method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | ||
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Ohazakadoma Kadoma, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Kazuo 2-6-2 Mayumi Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Maki, Masao 3-46-15, Fukigaoka Nabari-shi, Mie-ken / JP | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91115541.4 | 13.09.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | JP19900244357 | 14.09.1990 Original published format: JP 24435790 | JP19900259669 | 27.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25966990 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0475427 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475427 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/10 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
H05B3/30 (EP);
H05B3/20 (KR);
A47D13/025 (EP);
H05B3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | Heizelement und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1992/12] | English: | A heating element and a method for manufacturing the same | [1992/12] | French: | Elément de chauffage et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1992/12] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.1994 | SE | 28.02.1995 | [1999/42] |
Former [1996/03] | SE | 28.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1222504 (TRANSYSTEMS LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, M section, vol. 1, no. 164, December 23, 1977 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 6056 M 77 |