EP0476620 - Noise reducing element and electrical circuit having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/13] | Noise eliminating element and electrical circuit having the same | ||
[1997/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MELCOR JAPAN CO., LTD. 5-7-28, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Uemura, Kinichi 2-14-21, Yokodai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states MELCOR JAPAN CO., LTD. 5-7-28, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Uemura, Kinichi 2-14-21, Yokodai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohtsubo, Kazuo 5-7-28, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Uemura, Kinichi 2-14-21, Yokodai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91115850.9 | 18.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | JP19900249662 | 18.09.1990 Original published format: JP 24966290 | JP19900417874 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41787490 | JP19910123202 | 04.03.1991 Original published format: JP 12320291 | JP19910203577 | 19.07.1991 Original published format: JP 20357791 | [1992/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0476620 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0476620 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476620 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/00, H03H2/00 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
H04R23/002 (EP,US);
H02H9/044 (EP,US);
H04R3/04 (EP,US);
H10N10/00 (EP,US);
H10N10/10 (EP,US);
Y10S257/93 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/13] | H01L35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/13] | Title | German: | Geräusch reduzierendes Element und elektrische Schaltung mit diesem Element | [1997/02] | English: | Noise reducing element and electrical circuit having the same | [1997/02] | French: | Elément réducteur de bruit et circuit électrique le comprenant | [1997/02] |
Former [1992/13] | Geräusch ausschaltendes Element und elektrische Schaltung an diesem Element | ||
Former [1992/13] | Noise eliminating element and electrical circuit having the same | ||
Former [1992/13] | Elément éliminateur de bruit et circuit électrique le comprenant | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/35: Teilanmeldung 96108582.6 eingereicht am 30/05/96 | EPB 1996/35: Divisional application 96108582.6 filed on 30/05/96 | EPB 1996/35: Demande divisionnaire 96108582.6 déposée le 30/05/96 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96108582.6 / EP0739044 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3435259 (METTE HERBERT L) | Examination | EP0339715 |