EP0532792 - Digital telecommunications exchange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hesse, Dieter Hanfelderstrasse 5 A W-8000 München 71 / DE | [1993/12] | Application number, filing date | 91116051.3 | 20.09.1991 | [1993/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532792 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532792 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0407 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/12] | Title | German: | Digitale Fernmeldevermittlungsanlage | [1993/12] | English: | Digital telecommunications exchange | [1993/12] | French: | Central numérique de télécommunication | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 05.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 29.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION Bd. 56, Nr. 2/3, 1. Januar 1982, HARLOW Seiten 135 - 147; S. DAS ET AL: 'ITT 1240 Digital Exchange Digital Hardware Description' | [X] - ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION Bd. 56, Nr. 2/3, 1. Januar 1982, HARLOW Seiten 126 - 134; R. BONAMI ET AL: 'ITT 1240 Digital Exchange Architecture' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, 28 MAI -1 JUNI 1990,BAND 4 SEITEN 7-14, STOCKHOLM SE J.P. GLON ET AL: 'An ATM Switching Unit Architecture for BISDN' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, 28 MAI -1 JUNI 1990, BAND 6 SEITEN 87-92, STOCKHOLM SE G. DOMANN: 'Two Years of Experience with Broadband ISDN Field Trial' | [A] - ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION Bd. 56, Nr. 1, 1981, HARLOW Seiten 45 - 56; G. TOLUSSO ET AL: 'Application of Digital Control to Handling Non-Voice Services' |