EP0477832 - Browning composition for microwave cooking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Chern J. 905 Novelda Road Alhambra, California 91801 / US | 02 /
Melachouris, Nicholas 2021 Glastonbury Road Westlake Village, California 91361 / US | [1992/14] | Application number, filing date | 91116186.7 | 24.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | US19900587082 | 24.09.1990 Original published format: US 587082 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477832 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477832 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23P1/08, A23L1/01, A21D13/00, A23L1/227 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
A23L27/215 (EP,US);
A21D13/28 (EP,US);
A23L5/19 (EP,US);
A23P20/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/14] | Title | German: | Bräunungszusammensetzung für Mikrowellenkochen | [1992/14] | English: | Browning composition for microwave cooking | [1992/14] | French: | Composition de brunissement pour la cuisson aux micro-ondes | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4001437 (JAEGGI KURT, et al); | [A]EP0303511 (CAMPBELL SOUP CO [US]) | [A] - D.R.SUDERMAN 'batter and breading technology' 1983 , ELLIS HORWOOD , CHICHESTER, GB pages 15,20,26,27 |