EP0477833 - Composition for therapeutic and/or cosmetic use for treatment of circulatory diseases and for aesthetic medicine treatments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sternberg Ruiu, Rosa, Dr. Via Palmanova, 91 I-20132 Milano / IT | [1992/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al SAIC BREVETTI s.r.l. Galleria San Babila, 4/D I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91116188.3 | 24.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | IT19900021606 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: IT 2160690 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477833 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/12, A61K7/48 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
A61Q19/06 (EP);
A61K31/685 (KR);
A61K38/39 (EP);
A61K8/553 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP);
A61K8/735 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/39, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/39, A61K31/715, A61K31/685 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1992/14] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung für therapeutische und/oder kosmetische Verwendung zur Behandlung von Kreislauferkrankungen und zur mit ästhetischen Arzneimitteln Behandlungen | [1992/14] | English: | Composition for therapeutic and/or cosmetic use for treatment of circulatory diseases and for aesthetic medicine treatments | [1992/14] | French: | Composition pour utilisation thérapeutique et/ou cosmétique pour le traitement des maladies de la circulation et pour les traitements aux médicaments esthétiques | [1992/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 20.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62209010 ; | [A]JP58201708 ; | [A]FR2356427 (ANA LABORATOIRES [FR]); | [Y]WO8707502 (PHARES PHARM RES NV [NL]); | [Y]FR2614787 (POLA KASEI KOGYO KK [JP]) | [Y] - DATABASE DERWENT, WPIL, accession no. 87-296405 [42], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & & JP-A-62 209 010 (KOBAYASHI KOSE K.K.) 14-09-1987, & JP62209010 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 41 (C-211)[1478], 22nd February 1984; & JP-A-58 201 708 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO K.K.) 24-11-1983, & JP58201708 A 00000000 | [A] - MINERVA CARDIOANGIOLOGICA, vol. 34, no. 4, April 1986, pages 251-254; A. LAPILLI et al.: "Metodiche alternative nel trattamento dell'ulcera varicosa e risultati" |