EP0480259 - A method of assembling a cable coil package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTERMO KABEL AB Box 14 S-36075 Alstermo / SE | [1992/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ericsson, Eddie Tomtestigen 28 S-38200 Nybro / SE | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Pohl, Herbert, et al Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Pohl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116494.5 | 27.09.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | SE19900003246 | 11.10.1990 Original published format: SE 9003246 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480259 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/04 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B65D85/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Drahtrollenverpackung | [1992/16] | English: | A method of assembling a cable coil package | [1992/16] | French: | Procédé pour assembler un emballage pour câbles enroulés | [1992/16] | File destroyed: | 17.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 15.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2943732 (KOVALESKI JOSEPH J, et al); | [AD]DE3703018 (HUBER & DROTT [AT]); | [Y]AT388357B (ROSENDAHL MASCH GMBH [AT]) |