EP0481268 - Torsional vibration damper arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Springer, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Plinderheide 37 W-4404 Telgte / DE | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116504.1 | 27.09.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | DE19904031312 | 04.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4031312 | [1992/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481268 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
F16F15/123 (EP);
F16F15/3156 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/17] | Title | German: | Torsionsschwingungsdämpferanordnung | [1992/17] | English: | Torsional vibration damper arrangement | [1992/17] | French: | Arrangement d'un amortisseur de vibrations de torsion | [1992/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 10.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 12.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/21] | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53073730 ; | [X]FR2554891 ; | [Y]US2215671 ; | [Y]US3107551 ; | [A]US4483684 ; | [A]EP0270980 ; | [A]GB2189307 ; | [A]DE3603209 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2, no. 107 (M-78)(3230) 6. September 1978 & JP-A-53 073 730 ( MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO ) 30. Juni 1978, & JP53073730 A 00000000 |