EP0533987 - Tank inspection light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Papenmeier, Friedrich Horst Ob der Kluse 6 D-58239 Schwerte / DE | [1993/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116537.1 | 27.09.1991 | [1993/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533987 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00, F21V25/12 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
F21V25/12 (EP);
G02B6/0008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1993/13] | Title | German: | Fassleuchte | [1993/13] | English: | Tank inspection light | [1993/13] | French: | Eclairage d'inspection de cuve | [1993/13] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2794113 ; | [YD]DE7425752U ; | [A]DE2814962 |