EP0482386 - Rotary-anode type X-ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Katsuhiro, c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Anno, Hidero, c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Sugiura, Hiroyuki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Kitami, Takayuki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116670.0 | 30.09.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | JP19900279350 | 19.10.1990 Original published format: JP 27935090 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482386 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482386 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/10 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
F16C33/10 (EP,US);
H01J35/10 (KR);
H01J35/104 (EP,US);
H01J2235/106 (EP,US);
H01J2235/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/34] |
Former [1992/18] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Drehanoden-Röntgenröhre | [1992/18] | English: | Rotary-anode type X-ray tube | [1992/18] | French: | Tube à rayons X avec anode tournante | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3720853 (ATLEE Z, et al); | [AD]US4210371 (GERKEMA JAN [NL], et al); | [Y]US4914684 (UPADHYA KAMLESHWAR [US]); | [YD]EP0378273 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [Y]US4956858 (UPADHYA KAMLESHWAR [US]) |