EP0492067 - Construction module as part of a toy construction kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PALIMONDIAL S.A. 16A, boulevard de la Foire 2015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states PALIMONDIAL S.A. 16A, boulevard de la Foire 1528 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states PALIMONDIAL S.A. 32, Rue J.P. Brasseur Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larws, Peter Schlappmuehler Pfad 13 W-6390 Usingen / DE | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [1992/27] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116749.2 | 01.10.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | DE19904041953 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4041953 | DE19914101756 | 22.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4101756 | [1992/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0492067 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0492067 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0492067 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/06 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
A63H33/062 (EP,US);
A63H33/06 (KR);
A63H33/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Steckbaustein als Teil eines Spielbausatzes | [1992/27] | English: | Construction module as part of a toy construction kit | [1992/27] | French: | Pièce de raccordement de construction faisant partie d'un jeu de construction | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.1995
17.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE LEGO A/S Aastvej 1 Dk- 7190 Billund / DK Opponent's representative Wittrup, Flemming Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.1995
17.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE LEGO A/S Aastvej 1 Dk- 7190 Billund / DK Opponent's representative WITTRUP, Flemming c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | 14.06.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.09.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.12.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.04.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1994 | [2000/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2920793 (RCA CORP); | [A]AU514062B ; | [A]DE8205825U ; | [A]GB2098495 (BOOK LOAN PUBLISHING); | [A]DE3223806 (STREIFF ANDREAS); | [A]GB2185192 (TOMY KOGYO CO); | [A]GB2231502 (PHILIP & TACEY LTD [GB]) | by applicant | DE1868651U | DE1202694 | DD76418 | AT327725B | DE2920743 | Opposition | DE1868651U | DE1202694 | DD76418 | AT327725B | DE2920743 |