EP0485726 - Nozzle for injecting gas into the cavity of a mould for plastic material, in particular an injection mould [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.1994 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Möller Werke GmbH Kupferhammer D-33649 Bielefeld / DE | [1992/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gnass, Christian Vilsendorfer Strasse 2 W-4800 Bielefeld 15 / DE | 02 /
Plöger, Horst Botweg 18 W-4800 Bielefeld 14 / DE | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 20 D-33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116815.1 | 02.10.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | DE19904036412 | 15.11.1990 Original published format: DE 4036412 | [1992/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0485726 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0485726 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/17 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
B29C45/1736 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Düse zum Injizieren von Gas in die Kavität eines Kunststoffformwerkzeugs, insbesondere einer Spritzgussform | [1992/21] | English: | Nozzle for injecting gas into the cavity of a mould for plastic material, in particular an injection mould | [1992/21] | French: | Buse pour l'injection de gaz dans la cavité d'un moule pour matière plastique, notamment un moule d'injection | [1992/21] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 10.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP1095007 ; | [Y]JP60008029 ; | [Y]JP55082626 ; | [Y]EP0385175 ; | [YP]EP0421842 ; | [Y]DE2640607 ; | [A]EP0283207 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 305 (M-849)(3653) 13. Juli 1989 & JP-A-1 095 007 ( HONDA MOTOR CO. ), & JP1095007 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 121 (M-382)(1844) 25. Mai 1985 & JP-A-60 008 029 ( ICHIKO KOGYO ), & JP60008029 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 125 (M-030)3. September 1980 & JP-A-55 082 626 ( ASAHI CHEM. IND. CO. ), & JP55082626 A 00000000 |