blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0479270

EP0479270 - Recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.1997
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.05.1997 [1997/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yokoi, Katsuyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
02 / Takemura, Makoto, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
03 / Terasawa, Koji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
04 / Fukazawa, Hideo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
05 / Kurata, Tetsuji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
06 / Kawaguchi, Koichiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
07 / Shinoda, Kazuhiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
[1992/15]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date91116831.802.10.1991
[1992/15]
Priority number, dateJP1990026689403.10.1990         Original published format: JP 26689490
JP1991000776825.01.1991         Original published format: JP 776891
[1992/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0479270
Date:08.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0479270
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/01, B41J11/20
[1992/15]
CPC:
B41J25/3088 (EP,US); B41J25/308 (EP,US); B41J25/3082 (EP,US);
B41J25/34 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/15]
TitleGerman:Aufzeichnungsgerät[1992/15]
English:Recording apparatus[1992/15]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement[1992/15]
Examination procedure31.10.1991Examination requested  [1992/15]
07.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.10.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.10.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.1996Fee for grant paid
16.01.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.02.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3338712  (SHARP KK [JP]);
 [A]US4452542  (AKAZAWA HIROYUKI [JP]);
 [A]EP0176179  (TEKTRONIX INC [US]);
 [A]US4709247  (PIATT MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [AD]US4723129  (ENDO ICHIRO [JP], et al);
 [AD]US4740796  (ENDO ICHIRO [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.