EP0479293 - Method of separating metal-containing waste components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krauss, Peter, Prof. Dr. Hagenweg 5 D-72766 Reutlingen / DE | [1992/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116876.3 | 02.10.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | DE19904031417 | 04.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4031417 | [1992/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479293 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479293 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B03B9/06 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B03B9/06 (EP);
B03B9/061 (EP);
B03C1/30 (EP);
Y02W30/52 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, LI, NL, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Auftrennung von metallhaltigen Müllkomponenten | [1992/15] | English: | Method of separating metal-containing waste components | [1992/15] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation des composantes de déchets contenant des métaux | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 03.01.1996 | [1998/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3848813 (STANCZYK M, et al); | [A]US4098464 (NIEDNER PETER, et al); | [A]US4242197 (ROTHERT HORST [DE], et al); | [A]GB1594216 (MATERIAL RECOVERY LTD); | [A]US4874134 (WIENS THOMAS J [US]) |