EP0480318 - Tire building apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conger, Kenneth Dean 38 Lindsey Drive Munroe Falls, OH 44262 / US | 02 /
Peck, Arland Arthur 3298 Samuel Road Akron, OH 44312 / US | 03 /
Broyles, Henry David 1584 Gulf Street, N.W. Uniontown, OH 44685 / US | 04 /
Hart, James Michael 36 Rue Chatles Quint L-2380 Merl / LU | 05 /
Becker, Michael Lee 354 W. Ingleside Drive Akron, OH 44319 / US | 06 /
Testa, Dean Charles 4363 S. Main Street Akron, OH 44319 / US | 07 /
Stokes, James Dale 4127 Idlebrook Drive Akron, OH 44313 / US | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [1992/16] | Application number, filing date | 91116930.8 | 04.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | US19900596360 | 12.10.1990 Original published format: US 596360 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0480318 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0480318 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480318 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/08 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B29D30/08 (EP);
B29D30/38 (KR);
B29D2030/206 (EP);
B29D2030/207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1992/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reifenaufbau | [1992/16] | English: | Tire building apparatus and method | [1992/16] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de fabrication de pneus | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 12.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0246497 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]); | [X]EP0242689 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]); | [X]US4105487 (SUZUKI MASAYOSHI, et al); | [A]WO8000327 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [A]US2028078 (STATE WILL C, et al); | [A]GB2158400 (BATES W & A LTD) |