EP0480327 - Wringing device in particular for fringed strips for cleaning floors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDM S.R.L. Viale Delle Industrie 16/8 I-20020 Arese Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states VDM S.R.L. Viale Delle Industrie 16/8 I-20020 Arese, Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pagani, Elio Viale Sempione 19 I-20020 Arese, (Province of Milano) / IT | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91116956.3 | 04.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | IT19900021693 | 10.10.1990 Original published format: IT 2169390 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480327 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480327 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/60 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
A47L13/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/16] | Title | German: | Auswringvorrichtung für einen Mop | [1992/16] | English: | Wringing device in particular for fringed strips for cleaning floors | [1992/16] | French: | Essoreuse à balai | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH177911 ; | [A]US1517187 (BONSALL THOMAS L); | [A]US1633518 (FRANK CLAY); | [X]DE583653 (ARTHUR CHARLES PEARCE); | [A]US2535244 (VOORHIS WILLIAM G VAN, et al); | [A]US3504393 (FOSS PETER ERNEST, et al); | [X]US4852207 (YAMANE IZUMI [JP]) | by applicant | DE583653 | CH177911 | US4852207 |