EP0481313 - Integrity-enhanced thermoelectrics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO ELECTRON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 74 West Street Waltham Massachusetts 02254-9046 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states THERMO ELECTRON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 74 West Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02254-9046 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rolfe, Jonathan L. 82 Bay Road North Easton, Massachusetts 02356 / US | 02 /
Beaty, John S. 618 Pleasand Street Belmont, Massachusetts 02178 / US | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 91117019.9 | 07.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | US19900594850 | 09.10.1990 Original published format: US 594850 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481313 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/32 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
H10N10/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/17] | Title | German: | Thermoelektrische Anordnung mit erhöhter Zuverlassigkeit | [1992/17] | English: | Integrity-enhanced thermoelectrics | [1992/17] | French: | Dispositif thermo-électrique avec fiabilité améliorée | [1992/17] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/26] | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2997514 (ROEDER JR JOHN); | [A]EP0122121 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]); | [A]US4687879 (HENDRICKS TERRY J [US]); | [X]US4907060 (NELSON JOHN L [US], et al) |