Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0489240
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.05.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] |
07.02.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] |
13.08.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.05.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] |
09.01.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.05.1994 |
First examination report |
|
16.06.1992 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32] |
24.04.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] |
24.04.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] |