EP0482433 - Wood preserving agents containing polymeric nitrogen compounds and metal fixing acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Wolman GmbH Dr.-Wolman-Strasse 31-33 76547 Sinzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states Dr. Wolman GmbH Dr.-Wolman-Strasse 31-33 D-76547 Sinzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goettsche, Reimer, Dr. Waldstrasse 27 W-7570 Baden-Baden 19 / DE | 02 /
Reuther, Wolfgang, Dr. Am Pferchelhang 16 W-6900 Heidelberg / DE | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Langfinger, Klaus Dieter, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Langfinger, Klaus-Dieter, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117261.7 | 10.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | DE19904033419 | 20.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4033419 | [1992/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482433 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482433 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B27K3/52 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
A01N59/20 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
B27K3/22 (EP,US);
B27K3/34 (EP,US);
B27K3/343 (EP,US);
B27K3/52 (EP,US);
C08L79/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/20, A01N25/02, A01N43/84, A01N53/00, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
C08L97/02, C08L79/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | Polymere Stickstoffverbindungen und Metall fixierende Säuren enthaltende Holzschutzmittel | [1992/18] | English: | Wood preserving agents containing polymeric nitrogen compounds and metal fixing acids | [1992/18] | French: | Agents protecteurs du bois contenant des composés d'azote polymères et des acides fixateurs de métaux | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4038451 (BROWN FREDERICK L, et al); | [Y]US4075394 (MEYER VICTOR E); | [A]EP0234461 (WOLMAN GMBH DR [DE]); | [YD]EP0270848 (WOLMAN GMBH DR [DE]); | [AD]EP0320786 (WOLMAN GMBH DR [DE]); | [A]EP0370182 (RUETGERSWERKE AG [DE]) |