EP0536439 - Elastic vibration damper body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTLAND GUMMIWERKE GmbH & Co. Westlandstrasse 6 D-49324 Melle / DE | [1993/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kallweit, Jürg-Heinrich, Prof. Dr. Joh.-Sebastian-Bach-Strasse 20 W-4500 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Siebert, Achim Stüvestrasse 59 W-4520 Melle 5 / DE | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Jaeger, Klaus, et al propindus Patentanwälte NIEDMERS JAEGER KÖSTER Auguste-Viktoria-Allee 87 13403 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | Jaeger, Klaus, Dr., et al Jaeger, Böck & Köster, Patentanwälte, Postfach 16 20 D-82121 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117292.2 | 10.10.1991 | [1993/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536439 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16F3/08, F16F1/36 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
F16F1/3605 (EP);
F16F3/093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/15] | Title | German: | Federnder Dämpferkörper | [1993/15] | English: | Elastic vibration damper body | [1993/15] | French: | Corps d'amortisseur élastique | [1993/15] | File destroyed: | 22.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/23] | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.11.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3152751 ; | [X]DE3151508 ; | [X]FR2630796 ; | [X]US4887788 ; | [A]DE2036744 ; | [A]FR1570498 ; | [A]FR2188736 ; | [A]DE1224567 ; | [A]DE1238278 ; | [A]DE1812898 ; | [A]FR1440232 |