Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0480429
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
23.07.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
23.01.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] |
31.01.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
24.01.1997 |
Change - priority |
published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
05.12.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.07.1996 |
Change - priority |
published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] |
04.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.05.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.01.1996 |
First examination report |
|
09.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.05.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] |
16.03.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] |
28.02.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] |