Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2546419Y | Global Dossier | 03.09.1997 | Y2 | JPH0495993U | 19.08.1992 | U | Priority number | Date | JP6536391 | 20.08.1991 | JP10598190 | 11.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2557553Y | 10.12.1997 | Y2 | JPH0462892U | 28.05.1992 | U | Priority number | Date | JP10598290 | 11.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2816896B | 27.10.1998 | B2 | JPH04149389 | 22.05.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP27043290 | 11.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0480429 | Global Dossier | 19.03.1997 | B1 | EP0480429 | 05.05.1993 | A3 | EP0480429 | 15.04.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP10598290 | 11.10.1990 | JP27043290 | 11.10.1990 | JP10598190 | 11.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69125238T | 17.07.1997 | T2 | DE69125238D1 | 24.04.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP10598290 | 11.10.1990 | JP27043290 | 11.10.1990 | JP10598190 | 11.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2099113T | 16.05.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP10598290 | 11.10.1990 | JP27043290 | 11.10.1990 | JP10598190 | 11.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR920008309 | 27.05.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10598290 | 11.10.1990 | JP27043290 | 11.10.1990 | JP10598190 | 11.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5123472 | 23.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10598290 | 11.10.1990 | JP27043290 | 11.10.1990 | JP10598190 | 11.10.1990 |