EP0480429 - Apparatus for lifting and tilting slats in a venetian blind [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSO COMPANY, LIMITED 4-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states TOSO COMPANY, LIMITED 4-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagashima, Masahiro c/o TOSO COMPANY, LIMITED, 4-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Kazuya c/o TOSO COMPANY, LIMITED, 4-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Inaba, Tadashi c/o TOSO COMPANY, LIMITED, 4-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/12] |
Former [1992/16] | 01 /
Nagashima Masahiro c/o Toso Company, Limited, 4-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Hayashi, Kazuya c/o Toso Company, Limited, 4-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Inaba, Tadashi c/o Toso Company, Limited, 4-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/16] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117305.2 | 10.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | JP19900270432 | 11.10.1990 Original published format: JP 27043290 | JP19900105981U | 11.10.1990 Original published format: JP 10598190 U | JP19900105982U | 11.10.1990 Original published format: JP 10598290 U | [1997/11] |
Former [1996/36] | JP19900270432 | 11.10.1990 | |
JP19900105981 | 11.10.1990 | ||
JP19900105982U | 11.10.1990 | ||
Former [1992/16] | JP19900270432 | 11.10.1990 | |
JP19900105981 | 11.10.1990 | ||
JP19900105982 | 11.10.1990 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0480429 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0480429 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480429 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/322, E06B9/307 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
E06B9/307 (EP,US);
E06B9/322 (EP,KR,US);
E06B2009/3225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/16] | Title | German: | Jalousieaufzieh- und Wendemechanismus | [1992/16] | English: | Apparatus for lifting and tilting slats in a venetian blind | [1992/16] | French: | Mécanisme de levage et d'inclinaison des lamelles d'un store vénitien | [1997/12] |
Former [1992/16] | Mécanisme de levage et d'inclinaison des lamelles d'un store rémitien | Examination procedure | 19.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.10.1997 | [2004/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2737235 (OTTO HEDIGER); | [A]DE2852238 (WAREMA RENKHOFF GMBH & CO KG); | [A]GB1201508 (DOLENZ ERNST [AT]) |