EP0480448 - Glue based on condensation products of urea-formaldehyde with an E-O emission class of formaldehyde, its manufacture and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMKO, S.P. Strazske / CS | [1992/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lipka, Radislav Komenského 30 Michalovce / CS | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/16] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117363.1 | 11.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | CS19900004935 | 11.10.1990 Original published format: CS 493590 | [1992/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480448 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G14/08, C09J161/34 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
C08G14/08 (EP);
C09J161/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, IT, NL [1992/16] | Title | German: | Leime auf der Basis von Harnstoff-Formaldehyd-Kondensationsprodukten der Formaldehyd-Emissionsklasse E-O sowie ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1992/16] | English: | Glue based on condensation products of urea-formaldehyde with an E-O emission class of formaldehyde, its manufacture and use | [1992/16] | French: | Colle à partir de produits de condensation urée-formaldéhyde avec une classe d'émission du formaldéhyde E-O ainsi que leur production et utilisation | [1992/16] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/20] | 21.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0282903 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 22, 30. Mai 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 187815H, KELLNER ET AL.: 'Manufacture of phenol-formaldehyde resin binders with low free monomer content' Seite 37 ;Spalte 1 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 20, 13. November 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 175375P, KELLNER ET AL.: 'Manufacture of urea-formaldehyde condensates.' Seite 55 ;Spalte 1 ; |