EP0468546 - Package for agricultural products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states Kyokujitsu Co. Ltd. 6-18, 3-chome, Kitaaoyama Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Koike Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-7, 3-chome, Kinshi Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyokujitsu Co. Ltd. 6-18, 3-chome, Kitaaoyama Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states Koike Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-7, 3-chome, Kinshi Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INCORPORATED 2-5, 3-chome, Kasumigaseki Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyokujitsu Co. Ltd. 6-18, 3-chome, Kitaaoyama Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states Koike Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-7, 3-chome, Kinshi Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shima, Yoshisuke 22-12, 1-chome, Kakinokizaka, Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shibasaki, Kunihiro 16-49, 6-chome, Honcho Shigi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Konishi, Yoshiyuki A-35, 5 Takiharu-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Ryuno, Toshiro C-35, 1-12 Matsushita-cho, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Fujita, Mitsunobu 31-15 2-chome, Chitose Atsuta-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 456 / JP | 06 /
Yoshida, Hisaji 1-63 Usui-Shinmachi Ohmuta-shi, Fukuoka-ken / JP | [1992/18] |
Former [1992/05] | 01 /
Shima, Yoshisuke 22-12, 1-chome, Kakinokizaka, Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Shibasaki, Kunihiro 16-49, 6-chome, Honcho Shigi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Konishi, Yoshiyuki A-35, 5 Takiharu-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Ryuno, Toshiro C-35, 1-12 Matsushita-cho, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Fujita, Mitsunobu 1-403 Irohaso, 3-8 Iroha-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Yoshida, Hisaji 1-63 Usui-Shinmachi Ohmuta-shi, Fukuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/05] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117683.2 | 12.10.1987 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | JP19860156560U | 13.10.1986 Original published format: JP 15656086 U | JP19860283990 | 27.11.1986 Original published format: JP 28399086 | JP19860183223U | 27.11.1986 Original published format: JP 18322386 U | JP19870096883U | 24.06.1987 Original published format: JP 9688387 U | JP19870181547 | 21.07.1987 Original published format: JP 18154787 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0468546 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0468546 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468546 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/20, B65B31/00 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B65D81/2069 (EP,US);
B65B25/02 (KR);
B65B31/00 (KR);
B65B31/006 (EP,US);
B65D79/008 (EP,KR,US);
B65D2565/387 (EP,US);
Y02W30/80 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/05] | B65D81/20 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/05] | Title | German: | Verpackung für landwirtschaftliche Produkte | [1992/05] | English: | Package for agricultural products | [1992/05] | French: | Emballage pour produits agricoles | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87114867.2 / EP0267443 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.02.1995 | LI | 15.02.1995 | NL | 15.02.1995 | DE | 16.05.1995 | [1995/49] |
Former [1995/40] | CH | 15.02.1995 | |
LI | 15.02.1995 | ||
DE | 16.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | CH | 15.02.1995 | |
LI | 15.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0104698 (TETRA PAK INT [SE]); | [A]DE2707004 (CONTINENTAL GROUP); | [A]EP0173763 (RAKU KUNSTSTOFF VERPACKUNGSWER [DE]); | [A]EP0164285 (BONNINGUE MICHEL) | [A] - MODERN PLASTICS INTERNATIONAL 1 June 1980, pages 38 - 40; CARLSON ET AL.: 'Oppportunities in oriented nitrile resin containers' | Examination | - MODERN PLASTICS INTERNATIONAL, June 1980, pages 38 - 40; Carlson et al.: "Opportunities in oriented nitrile resin containers" |