EP0485765 - Vehicle jack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states August Bilstein GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 11 51 58240 Ennepetal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states AUGUST BILSTEIN GMBH & CO. KG Postfach 11 51 D-58240 Ennepetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metzen, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. In der Huf 1 W-5509 Kell / DE | [1992/21] | Application number, filing date | 91117947.1 | 22.10.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | DE19900015483U | 12.11.1990 Original published format: DE 9015483 U | [1992/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485765 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485765 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B66F3/12 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
B66F3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/21] | Title | German: | Wagenheber | [1992/21] | English: | Vehicle jack | [1992/21] | French: | Cric pour véhicules | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE9005572U ; | [A]FR2353480 (BILSTEIN AUGUST [DE]); | [A]EP0232836 (STORZ E A KG [DE]) |