EP0483644 - Device for making and at the same time distributing whipped cream or similar products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRM S.p.A. Via A. Fusari, 21, Strada Provinciale 126 I-20073 Codogno Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states CRM S.p.A. Via A. Fusari, 21, Strada Provinciale 126 I-20073 Codogno, Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cigolini, Aldo via Duca d'Aosta, 46, Retegno I-20070 Fombio / IT | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Manitz, Gerhart, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Manitz, Gerhart, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Rotermund Patentanwälte Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117987.7 | 22.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | IT19900022045U | 31.10.1990 Original published format: IT 2204590 U | [1992/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483644 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483644 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/12, F25D3/06, F25D3/12, A01J13/00 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
A47J43/123 (EP);
A01J13/00 (EP);
F25D3/06 (EP);
F25D3/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur gleichzeitigen Erzeugung und Abgabe von Schlagsahne oder dergleichen | [1992/19] | English: | Device for making and at the same time distributing whipped cream or similar products | [1992/19] | French: | Dispositif pour faire et distribuer à la fois de la crème fouettée ou un produit similaire | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.1995 | DK | 31.05.1995 | ES | 31.05.1995 | FR | 31.05.1995 | GB | 31.05.1995 | GR | 31.05.1995 | NL | 31.05.1995 | SE | 31.08.1995 | AT | 22.10.1995 | CH | 31.10.1995 | LI | 31.10.1995 | LU | 31.10.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/11] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
ES | 31.05.1995 | ||
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
GR | 31.05.1995 | ||
NL | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
AT | 22.10.1995 | ||
FR | 27.10.1995 | ||
CH | 31.10.1995 | ||
LI | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
ES | 31.05.1995 | ||
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
GR | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
AT | 22.10.1995 | ||
FR | 27.10.1995 | ||
CH | 31.10.1995 | ||
LI | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
GR | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
AT | 22.10.1995 | ||
FR | 27.10.1995 | ||
CH | 31.10.1995 | ||
LI | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
GR | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
AT | 22.10.1995 | ||
FR | 27.10.1995 | ||
CH | 31.10.1995 | ||
LI | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
AT | 22.10.1995 | ||
FR | 27.10.1995 | ||
CH | 31.10.1995 | ||
LI | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1997/16] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
AT | 22.10.1995 | ||
FR | 27.10.1995 | ||
CH | 31.10.1995 | ||
LI | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
FR | 27.10.1995 | ||
CH | 31.10.1995 | ||
LI | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/16] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
FR | 27.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
GB | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
SE | 31.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1511452 (FOLGER HENRY C); | [YD]CH405196 (BAENZIGER ERNST [CH]); | [A]FR94172E (JOSEF KUEMMERLING [DE]); | [AD]CH586031 (BACHMANN FRIEDRICH); | [Y]DE3333026 (SCHMITT CARL HEINRICH); | [A]DE3521982 (KUEMMERLING JOSEF); | [A]US4656840 (LOOFBOURROW JAMES G [US], et al); | [A]DE8912150U |