EP0482620 - Birefringent film, process for producing the same, retardation film, elliptically polarizing plate, and liquid crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshimi, Hiroyuki, c/o NITTON DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nagatsuka, Tatsuki, c/o NITTON DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Fujimura, Yasuo, c/o NITTON DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Osuga, Tatsuya, c/o NITTON DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118093.3 | 23.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | JP19900286646 | 24.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28664690 | JP19910287174 | 07.10.1991 Original published format: JP 28717491 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0482620 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0482620 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482620 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
G02B5/30 (KR);
G02F1/133634 (EP,US);
G02F2413/13 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/18] | G02B5/30, G02F1/335 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1992/18] | Title | German: | Doppelbrechender Film, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, verzögernder Film, elliptischer Polarisator und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [1992/18] | English: | Birefringent film, process for producing the same, retardation film, elliptically polarizing plate, and liquid crystal display | [1992/18] | French: | Film biréfringent, procédé pour sa fabrication, film retardant, polarisateur elliptique et dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 20.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0367288 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0112488 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP0382460 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 298 (P-1065)21 June 1990 | Examination | JP2089006 | JPH02253233 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 298 (P-1065)21 June 1990 & JP-A-2 089 006, & JP2089006 A 19900621 |